Assembly | 08/23/2023 | signed chap.305 | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1433 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7382 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.292 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | referred to governmental operations |