Assembly | 11/17/2023 | approval memo.26 | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.646 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.861 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6463A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.609 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | referred to children and families |