Assembly | 06/30/2023 | signed chap.161 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1562 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7479 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.414 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.414 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means |