Assembly | 06/30/2023 | signed chap.163 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1358 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7059 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.299 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |