Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s7077a | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | rules report cal.838 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | print number 7409a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | referred to local governments |