Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s9808 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.490 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reference changed to local governments | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.208 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.840 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | rules report cal.840 | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | print number 7418a | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | referred to local governments |