Assembly | 06/30/2023 | signed chap.166 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1554 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7463 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.300 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.300 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules |