Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.419 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1101 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5376 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.301 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | referred to environmental conservation |