Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted by s7395c | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.778 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.778 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 7458c | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | print number 7458b | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | print number 7458a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | referred to real property taxation |