Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.210 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.797 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | rules report cal.797 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 7464a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules |