Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.420 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1782 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7434A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.611 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.611 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | print number 7478a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | referred to governmental operations |