Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted by s5868b | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.393 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | print number 7491b | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2024 | print number 7491a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2024 | amend and recommit to environmental conservation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to environmental conservation |