Assembly | 04/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | amended on third reading 7494b | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.349 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | print number 7494a | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to health |