Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.60 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.622 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.550 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6239 | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.460 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported |