Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.79 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1573 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7224B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.321 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.321 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2024 | print number 7563b | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | print number 7563a |