Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted by s7297c | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.171 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.171 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | print number 7636c | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | print number 7636b | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2024 | print number 7636a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to housing |