Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s7547a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.531 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.531 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | print number 7656a | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | amend and recommit to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to judiciary |