Assembly | 12/22/2023 | signed chap.749 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1786 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7534 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.612 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.612 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | referred to judiciary |