Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.80 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1571 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7181B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.396 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.396 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | print number 7693a | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental employees |