Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.37 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1692 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6523A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.172 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.172 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 7701a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to veterans' affairs |