Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.346 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.233 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6112A | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.352 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | print number 7716a | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | amend and recommit to higher education | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reference changed to higher education | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to education |