Assembly | 11/14/2023 | signed chap.629 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1859 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7574 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.805 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | rules report cal.805 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means |