Assembly | 10/01/2024 | signed chap.422 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1163 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6674A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.429 | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | print number 7790a | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to insurance |