Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.611 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.611 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | print number 7844a | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to transportation |