Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.38 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.882 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7577A | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.331 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2024 | print number 7862a | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2024 | amend and recommit to insurance |