Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s8338a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.613 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 7956a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to transportation |