Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.472 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.387 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7617 | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.313 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | reported |