Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted by s7670 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.173 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to libraries and education technology |