Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted by s7669a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.251 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to libraries and education technology | ||
Assembly | 11/03/2023 | print number 8043a | ||
Assembly | 11/03/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to libraries and education technology |