Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.473 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.946 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7801A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | amended on third reading 8081b | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.430 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | print number 8081a | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |