Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s7680a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.615 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | print number 8127a | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation |