Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s7694a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.534 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.534 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | print number 8148a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | amend and recommit to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to science and technology |