Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.61 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.623 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1661 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9259 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.174 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.174 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | print number 8162a | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to veterans' affairs |