Assembly | 01/23/2024 | substituted by s7702a | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.2 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | rules report cal.2 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | print number 8207a | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to health |