Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.477 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.793 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2739A | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.383 | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | print number 8275a | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |