Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.40 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1921 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9857 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.431 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported |