Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.349 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1412 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7887 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.176 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means |