Senate | 06/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.326 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.326 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 8333a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes |