Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.535 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1500 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8348A | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.53 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | rules report cal.53 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | print number 8365a | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | amend and recommit to health |