Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | print number 8373c | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | print number 8373b | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | print number 8373a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |