Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.481 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.791 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8934 | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.355 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported |