Assembly | 07/11/2024 | signed chap.198 | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1362 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7703B | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.257 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.257 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | print number 8450b | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | print number 8450a |