LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A08487
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A08487
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A08487
Action History
Assembly
02/26/2024
substituted by s8010
Assembly
02/15/2024
advanced to third reading cal.315
Assembly
02/13/2024
reported
Assembly
01/23/2024
reported referred to codes
Assembly
01/04/2024
referred to children and families