Assembly | 02/13/2024 | signed chap.78 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.176 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8022 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.291 | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2024 | referred to social services |