Assembly | 02/07/2024 | signed chap.29 | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.40 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8040 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.4 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | rules report cal.4 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2024 | referred to insurance |