Assembly | 01/26/2024 | signed chap.3 | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.26 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8019 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.216 | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2024 | referred to insurance |