Assembly | 02/07/2024 | signed chap.35 | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.45 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8055 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.243 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2024 | referred to health |