Assembly | 01/26/2024 | signed chap.6 | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.68 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8088 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.7 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | rules report cal.7 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2024 | referred to real property taxation |