Assembly | 02/07/2024 | signed chap.39 | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.65 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8085 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.8 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | rules report cal.8 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2024 | referred to racing and wagering |