Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.62 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.624 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1889 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8666A | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.73 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.73 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | print number 8560a | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to health |